CA AB2912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 5380 and 5500 of, and to add Sections 5501, 5502, and 5806 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Association finances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2912 IRWIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2912 Irwin By Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2912 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6377.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5267.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06Senate(Received pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14).)
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-18SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5168.)
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code5380Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code5500Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code5501New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code5502New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code5806New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback