CA AB2911 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51179, 51189, and 65302.5 of, and to add Section 65040.21 to, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 4291 and 4291.3 of, and to add Sections 4290.5 and 4295.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire safety.
Title
Fire safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2911 FRIEDMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2911 Friedman By Cannella (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2911 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2911 Friedman By Cannella (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2911 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 5971.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5485.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51179 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51189 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65040.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65302.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66474.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4290.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4293 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4295.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |