CA AB2905 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Communications and Conveyance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Communications and Conveyance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11549.58 of the Government Code, relating to communications.
Title
Office of Broadband and Digital Literacy: reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11549.58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |