CA AB2904 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49455.5 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: mobile vision care services: schoolsites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2904 CARRILLO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2904 CARRILLO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5438.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2290.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49455.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |