CA AB2900 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17059.2 and 23689 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Income taxation: credits: California Competes Tax Credit
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2900 J., E.D.& E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By GARCIA, E (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2900 Committee On J., E.D., & E. (Garcia, E.) By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2900 J., E.D.& E. Assembly Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2900 Committee On J., E.D., & E. (Garcia, E.) By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2900 J., E.D.& E. Assembly Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6526.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6328.) |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5345.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5111.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2016-03-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 3. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 7400 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17059.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23689 | Amended Code | Citation Text |