CA AB2898 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8630 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency services: local emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2898 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2898 Gloria By McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2898 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6377.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5292.).
2018-08-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5219.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8630Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback