CA AB2890 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 305, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 305, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 106875, 106880, 106885, 106890, 106892, 106900, 106910, 116275, and 116555 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 106876 of, to add Sections 106878, 106879, and 106898 to, to repeal Sections 106895 and 106896 of, and to repeal and add Section 106897 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 13625, 13626, 13627, 13627.1, 13627.2, 13627.3, 13628, 13628.5, 13629, and 13632 of, to add Section 13627.6 to, and to repeal Section 13627.5 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Drinking water and wastewater operator certification programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Patty Lopez [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2890 E.S.& T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By ALEJO (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2890 Committee On E.S. & T.M. (Alejo) By Hill (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2890 E.S.& T.M. Assembly Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2890 Committee On E.S. & T.M. (Alejo) By Hill (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2890 E.S.& T.M. Assembly Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 305, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6047.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4975.). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4769.) |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4719.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 27). |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |