CA AB2889 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 85301, 85305, 85306, 85307, 85315, 85316, 85317, and 85318 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: contribution limits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 85301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85318 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2889 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2889 |