CA AB2887 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 46392, 47613.5, and 49550 of the Education Code, to add Sections 8575.2 and 63089.81 to the Government Code, to add Sections 249.5 and 249.6 to the Labor Code, to add Sections 779.6, 10010.2, 12823.2, and 16482.2 to the Public Utilities Code, and to add Sections 22282.2, 31017, 35414, and 71602 to the Water Code, relating to statewide emergencies, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Statewide emergencies: mitigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46392 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47613.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63089.81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8575.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 249.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 249.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 10010.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 12823.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 16482.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 779.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 22282.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 31017 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 35414 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 71602 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2887 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2887 |