CA AB2886 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19804 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling Control Act: injunctive relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2886 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2886 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5161.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |