CA AB2885 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-28 - Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-28 - Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 20510) of Division 20 of the Elections Code, and to amend Section 84504.6 of the Government Code, relating to political campaigns.
Title
False campaign speech and online platform disclosures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 20510 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2885 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2885 |