CA AB2880 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 976, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 976, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69431.7 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 12207, 17053.87, and 23687 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Taxation: credits: College Access Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2880 Mia Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2880 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2880 Mia Bonta Assembly Third Reading By HANEY (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2880 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2880 Mia Bonta Assembly Third Reading By HANEY (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 976, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4983.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4876.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69431.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23687 | Amended Code | Citation Text |