CA AB2880 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 83123.7 of, and to repeal and add Section 83123.6 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: local enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2880 HARPER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2880 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2880 HARPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2880 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2880 HARPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6488.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5282.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5216.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 83123.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 83123.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 83123.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |