CA AB2880 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14615.1 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 10335 of the Public Contract Code, relating to state intellectual property.
Title
State intellectual property.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2880 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 3. Page 5175.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5012.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13988 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13988.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13988.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13988.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14615.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6253.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |