CA AB2876 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22650 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicle removal and impound.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: removal and impound authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2876 JONES-SAWYER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-07SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4828.)
2018-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code22650Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback