CA AB2870 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 532 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the military.
Title
Military: National Guard: youth challenge program: counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2870 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2870 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2870 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4528.) |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |