CA AB2867 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 825, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 825, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1473.7 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: postconviction relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2867 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2867 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2867 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2867 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2867 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 825, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 6376.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 5293.). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). |
2018-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 1. Page 4932.) |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4820.) |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10). |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1473.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 94.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |