CA AB2856 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21168.11 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: housing development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |