CA AB2855 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19057, 19131.5, 19306, and 19340 of, and to add Sections 19051.5 and 19307.5 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Income taxes: net operating losses: carrybacks: overpayments: estimated tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2855 BROUGH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2855 BROUGH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5497.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19051.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19057 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19131.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19307.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |