CA AB285 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14000.6, 65071, 65072.1, and 65072.2 of, and to add Section 65070.5 to, the Government Code, relating to transportation planning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Transportation Plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 285 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB285 Friedman et al. By Allen (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 285 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 18. Page 3121.).
2019-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-04SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2527.).
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19).
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and EQ.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 1793.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-03-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
2019-01-29AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
2019-01-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14000.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65070.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65071Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65072.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65072.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback