CA AB285 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6400, 6402, 6403, 6404, 6405, 6406, 6407, 6408, 6410, 6410.5, 22355, and 22457 of, to add Sections 6401.7, 6402.2, and 6409.1 to, and to repeal Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 6400) of Division 3 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations: registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Assembly - AB 285 GALLAGHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB285 Gallagher By Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 285 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB285 Gallagher By Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 285 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2670.). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2196.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1594.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2015-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22457 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6401.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6402.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6404 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6407 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6409.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6410.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |