CA AB2847 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1946 and 1951.3 of, and to add Section 1951.35 to, the Civil Code, relating to real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial real property: tenancy: abandonment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Assembly - AB 2847 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2847 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2847 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:15 a.m.
2018-07-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6059.).
2018-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4880.).
2018-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5167.)
2018-05-10AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1945Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1945.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code1946Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1951.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1951.35New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code2929.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback