CA AB2844 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26001, 26051.5, and 26200 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis catering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 28). |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 5). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26051.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |