CA AB2844 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 879, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 879, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 769.1 to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: agents and brokers.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2844 COOLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2844 Cooley By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2844 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2844 Cooley By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2844 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 879, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 7021.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5986.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 5160.) |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11557 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 769.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |