CA AB2839 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2036 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter qualifications: domicile: sexually violent predators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code2036New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback