CA AB2839 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 769, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 769, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1205 and 2900.5 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal penalties.
Title
Criminal penalties: nonpayment of fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2839 Thurmond By Leno (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2839 THURMOND Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2839 THURMOND Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 769, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5161.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4790.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2900.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |