CA AB2833 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17053.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: renter’s credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |