CA AB2830 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1386, 127671, 127672, and 127673 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 127671) of Part 2 of Division 107 of, to add Sections 127671.1, 127672.8, 127672.9, 127673.1, 127673.2, 127673.3, 127673.4, 127673.5, 127673.6, 127673.7, 127673.8, 127673.81, 127673.82, 127673.83, 127673.84, and 127674.1 to, to repeal Section 127671.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 127674 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health Care Payments Data Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2830 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 4832.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |