CA AB283 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Niello.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5845 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Services Oversight and Accountability Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 283 Jim Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-07SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Niello.
2023-06-12SenateOrdered to third reading.
2023-06-12SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2023-06-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-06-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7).
2023-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-03-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 889.)
2023-03-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-03-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14).
2023-02-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-01-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
2023-01-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5845Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback