CA AB2828 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 647 of the Penal Code, relating to prostitution.
Title
Soliciting a prostitute: multiple convictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |