CA AB2817 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.9 (commencing with Section 50495) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
House California Challenge Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2817 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments By ALVAREZ (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2817 Reyes et al. By Wiener (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2817 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2817 Reyes et al. By Wiener (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2817 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 8.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5016.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and HUMAN S. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 5003.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50495 | New Code | See Bill Text |