CA AB2810 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 934, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 934, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66023.6 to the Education Code, relating to student nutrition.
Title
Student nutrition: CalFresh: student eligibility: Federal Application for Student Aid data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2810 Arambula et al. By Min (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2810 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2810 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 934, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5090.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-10 | Senate | 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4871.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66023.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |