CA AB2808 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 21.1 (commencing with Section 22512) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary ticket sellers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2024-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.)
2024-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2024-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2024-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23).
2024-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2024-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
2024-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A., E., S., & T. Read second time and amended.
2024-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A., E., S., & T. and P. & C.P.
2024-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2024-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22512New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback