CA AB2803 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3497 to the Civil Code, relating to public nuisance.
Title
Public nuisance: residential lead-based paint.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2803 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2803 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD., EQ. and APPR. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 27. Page 5260.) |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 1). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3497 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25323.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25531.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |