CA AB2803 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4573.10 to the Penal Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Inmates: unlawful communications.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4573.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |