CA AB2800 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 71155 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate change: state infrastructure planning: Climate-Safe Infrastructure Working Group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2800 Quirk Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2800 Quirk et al. By Caballero (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2800 Quirk Assembly Third Reading By CHAU (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 10.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7.).
2020-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 5).
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 15.)
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-03-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2020-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code71155Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback