CA AB2800 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35179.1 of the Education Code, relating to high school athletics.
Title
High school athletics: California High School Coaching Education and Training Program: heat illness.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2800 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2800 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2800 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4189.). |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4637.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35179.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |