CA AB2799 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26051.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult-use cannabis and medicinal cannabis: license application: OSHA training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2799 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5159.)
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. & E.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26051.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback