CA AB2795 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Coauthors revised.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Coauthors revised.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 78010 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: concurrent award of associate degree and high school diploma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78010 | New Code | See Bill Text |