CA AB2795 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23086 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Beverage Control Appeals Board.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2795 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2795 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5133.) |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23086 | Amended Code | Citation Text |