CA AB2793 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 36 and 877 of, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 820) to Title 10 of Part 2 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil claims.
Title
Asbestos tort claims.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 820 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 877 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2793 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2793 |