CA AB2792 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 83, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 83, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7823 of the Family Code, relating to parent and child relationship.
Title
Termination of the parent and child relationship: severe sexual abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2792 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2792 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2792 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 83, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5043.) |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 7822 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 7823 | Amended Code | Citation Text |