CA AB279 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 1287 and 1287.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to care facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intermediate care facilities and skilled nursing facilities: COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Assembly - AB 279 Muratsuchi Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB279 Muratsuchi et al. By Durazo Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 279 Muratsuchi Third Reading Urgency (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2022-01-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-10-07AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-02 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0.).
2021-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-23SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15).
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2021-06-16SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 1404.).
2021-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28).
2021-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 13).
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-01-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
2021-01-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1287Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1287.1Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279#93ENR
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB279

Bill Comments

feedback