CA AB2789 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5580 and 35160 of, and to add Section 5581 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Design-build projects: local agencies.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2789 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2789 Mullin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2789 Mullin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4683.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5036.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 35160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5580 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5581 | New Code | See Bill Text |