CA AB2787 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 351 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy storage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long duration bulk energy storage: procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2787 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 5530.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24).
2018-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code1710Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code351New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback