CA AB2782 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 104895.50) to Part 3 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthy California Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2016-04-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-03-31AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX.
2016-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2016-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2016-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code104655Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104895.50New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback