CA AB2780 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4058 and 4331 of the Family Code, relating to family law.
Title
Family law: support orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2780 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2780 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2780 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2780 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2780 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6139.). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5037.). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5042.) |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 3111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 4058 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 4100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 4331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |