CA AB278 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 34872, 34877, 34884, and 34886 of, and to add Sections 34876.5 and 34877.5 to, the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Municipal elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 278 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB278 Roger Hern (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 278 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB278 Roger Hern (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 278 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6527.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29). |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 5058.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2016-06-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 1865.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 25). |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV. |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2015-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 10010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 34872 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 34874 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 34875 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 34876 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 34876.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 34877 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 34877.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 34884 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 34885 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 34886 | Amended Code | Citation Text |