CA AB2777 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 340.16 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Sexual assault: statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2777 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2777 Wicks By Limón (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2777 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2777 Wicks By Limón (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2777 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 5127.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 5024.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 340.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |