CA AB2776 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 53.3 (commencing with Section 88730) to Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to workforce development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce development: workforce diploma program: California Community Colleges.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code88730New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback